Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/20/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/22/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/22/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/10/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/10/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/10/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/18/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/10/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/12/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/12/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/19/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/24/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/24/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/24/2002