Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/06/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/06/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/06/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/06/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/06/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/06/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/13/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/13/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/13/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/13/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/13/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/13/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/18/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/18/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/21/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/21/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/25/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/25/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/09/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/09/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/15/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/15/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/15/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/23/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/09/2002