Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/14/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/04/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/04/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/04/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/15/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/15/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/15/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/15/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/15/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/15/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/15/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/15/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/16/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/26/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/04/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/04/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/25/2002