Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/04/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/24/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/05/2002