Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/11/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/02/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/16/2002