Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/24/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/24/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/08/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/22/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/09/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/11/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/26/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/30/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/21/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/28/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/28/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/28/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/12/2002