Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/14/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/14/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/14/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/15/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/15/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/22/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/04/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/11/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/12/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/17/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/17/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/20/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/08/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/08/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/16/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/24/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/05/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/05/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/05/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/09/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/15/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/15/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/15/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/16/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/21/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/21/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/28/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/13/2002