Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/11/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/04/2002