Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/17/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/08/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/11/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/15/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/18/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/22/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/22/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/24/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/24/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/24/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/24/2002