Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/15/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/22/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/13/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/19/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/09/2002