Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/16/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/16/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/16/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/24/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/26/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/17/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/11/2002