Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/20/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/20/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/21/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/21/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/21/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/21/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/23/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/23/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/23/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/24/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/24/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/24/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/24/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/11/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/11/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/12/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/12/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/17/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/17/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/17/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/20/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/27/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/27/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/24/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/26/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/19/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew