Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/21/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/21/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/21/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/21/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/27/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/27/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/27/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/27/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/27/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/27/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/27/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/27/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/10/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/10/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/17/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/17/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/10/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/10/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/10/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/10/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/19/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/01/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/10/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/10/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/10/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/10/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/10/2002