Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/13/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/13/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/19/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/19/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/26/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/05/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/05/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/12/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/12/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/18/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/18/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/26/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/28/2002