Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/06/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/06/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/06/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/11/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/26/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/26/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/04/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/13/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/13/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/13/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/13/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/13/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/13/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/24/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/24/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/24/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/24/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/02/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/02/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/02/2002