Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/01/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/13/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/22/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/03/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/25/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2002