Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/22/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/22/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/12/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/12/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/21/2002