There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Patriotic Purchasing Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit certain expatriated corporations from being eligible for the award of Federal contracts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/23/2002Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/21/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/04/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform05/23/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4831.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4831. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2002)

Patriotic Purchasing Act of 2002 - Prohibits any foreign corporation that acquires a domestic corporation or partnership on or after the date that is ten years before this Act's enactment from being eligible to be awarded a Federal contract if immediately after such transaction, more than 80 percent of the stock of the acquiring corporation is held by former shareholders or partners of the domestic corporation or partnership. Substitutes 50 percent for 80 percent if: (1) the acquiring corporation does not have substantial business activities in the foreign country in which or under the law of which such corporation is created or organized; and (2) the stock of such corporation is publicly traded and the principal market for trading it is in the United States.