Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/21/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/16/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/04/2002