Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/17/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/25/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/09/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/15/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/17/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/01/2002