There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax incentives for the use of biodiesel as a fuel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/04/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Rural Development and Research.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/23/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2002Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/12/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/19/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/19/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/12/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/25/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/10/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/16/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/23/2002 Referred to
House Agriculture05/23/2002 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Rural Development, and Research06/04/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4843.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4843. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2002)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to establish a credit to promote the production and usage of biodiesel fuel. Requires a taxpayer to obtain a certification from the producer of the biodiesel which identifies the product produced in order to utilize the credit. Imposes a tax for biodiesel not used as fuel, but for which a credit was granted. Reduces motor fuel excise taxes on biodiesel mixtures.

Provides for transfers of funds from the Commodity Credit Corporation to the Highway Trust Fund in amounts equivalent to the reductions that would occur but for this Act.