Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/23/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/04/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/06/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/12/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/19/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/19/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/12/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/12/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/18/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/25/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/10/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/10/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/08/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/10/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/16/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/16/2002