Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/27/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/27/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/27/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/27/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/27/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/27/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/27/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/27/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/27/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/27/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/27/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/27/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/27/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/27/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/27/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/10/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/10/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/10/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/15/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/15/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/23/2002