There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Anti-Terrorism Explosives Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Terrorism Explosives Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To combat terrorism and defend the Nation against terrorist acts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/17/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-658.
06/05/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
09/17/2002Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 405.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-658.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/19/2002Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/19/2002Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/13/2002Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
06/13/2002Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
06/11/2002Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
06/11/2002Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
06/07/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/05/2002Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/05/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/05/2002 Referred to
06/19/2002 Markup by
09/17/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-658
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime06/07/2002 Referred to
06/11/2002 Hearings by
06/13/2002 Markup by
06/13/2002 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4864.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/17/2002)

Anti-Terrorism Explosives Act of 2002 - (Sec. 2) Rewrites Federal criminal code provisions regarding the purchase of explosives to prohibit the transport, shipment, or receipt of explosive materials without a Federal license, user permit, or limited permit. (Current law regulates such activities only to the extent that they occur in interstate or foreign commerce, includes exceptions such as for contiguous State transactions, and makes no mention of a limited permit.)

Allows a limited permit purchaser to buy explosive materials only four times in any 12-month period. Makes each limited permit valid for one year.

Requires employers who apply for licenses and user permits or limited permits to provide the names and appropriate identifying information regarding all employees who will be authorized by the employer to possess explosive materials, as well as fingerprints and a photograph of each responsible person. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to determine whether explosives possession by the responsible person or the employee would be unlawful and, if: (1) lawful, to notify the employer in writing or electronically of the determination and issue a letter of clearance; and (2) unlawful, to notify the employer and issue a document which confirms the determination, explains the grounds, provides information on how the disability may be relieved, and explains how the determination may be appealed.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to maintain an electronic record of each license, user permit, or limited permit issued or renewed on or after one year after this Act's effective date.

(Sec. 3) Expands the list of persons prohibited from receiving or possessing explosive materials to include: (1) aliens other than lawful permanent resident aliens; (2) persons dishonorably discharged from the armed forces; and (3) individuals who have renounced their U.S. citizenship.

(Sec. 4) Requires licensed manufacturers, licensed importers, and those who manufacture or import explosive materials or ammonium nitrate to furnish samples and relevant information when required by the Secretary.

(Sec. 5) Sets penalties for the destruction of property of institutions receiving Federal financial assistance.