Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/05/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/05/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/05/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/05/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/05/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/11/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/11/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/19/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/09/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/15/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/04/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew