Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/18/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/27/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/17/2002