Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/08/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/08/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/01/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/07/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/07/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/07/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/13/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/04/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/03/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/07/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/24/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/01/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/06/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/20/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/25/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/10/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/16/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 11/15/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/16/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/30/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/30/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/04/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/04/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 12/04/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/11/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/13/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/18/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 12/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 12/20/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/05/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/01/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/21/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/18/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/18/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/18/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/21/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/21/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/21/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/08/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/26/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/24/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/07/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/08/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/09/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/10/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/13/2002