Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/06/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/06/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/06/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/06/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/11/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/12/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/12/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/12/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/13/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/13/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/21/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/09/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/22/2002