Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/18/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/18/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/18/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/21/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/21/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/27/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/27/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/27/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/27/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 07/16/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/25/2002