Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/11/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/18/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/21/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/25/2002