Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/14/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/27/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/27/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/27/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/26/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/26/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/16/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/16/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/16/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/16/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/05/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/17/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/25/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 01/29/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/29/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/13/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/19/2002