Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/12/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/12/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/12/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/12/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/19/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/19/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/25/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/25/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/16/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/04/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/11/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/11/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/17/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/26/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/07/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/07/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/07/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/12/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/12/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/12/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/19/2002