Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/27/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/26/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/26/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/26/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/13/2002