Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/19/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/19/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/26/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/26/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/26/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/26/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/26/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/26/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/26/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/26/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/26/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/26/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/26/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/26/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/26/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/26/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/09/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/09/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/10/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/18/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 09/18/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/18/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/18/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/18/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/18/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/18/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/18/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/18/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/18/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/18/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/18/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/18/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/18/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/18/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/18/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/18/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/18/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/25/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/25/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/21/2002