Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/19/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/20/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/20/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/20/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/20/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/20/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/20/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/20/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/20/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/20/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/20/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/20/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/20/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/20/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/20/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/20/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/21/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/25/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/25/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/25/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/25/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/25/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/27/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/27/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/08/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/08/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/08/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/08/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/08/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/10/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/10/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/12/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/12/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/12/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/12/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/12/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/12/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/12/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/12/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/12/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/12/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/15/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/15/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/15/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/16/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/18/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/18/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2002