Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/21/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/21/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/21/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/21/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/21/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/21/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/21/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/27/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/27/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/27/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/27/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/27/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/10/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/24/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/24/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/24/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/24/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/24/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/24/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2002