Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/24/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/24/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/24/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/24/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/25/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/25/2002
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/10/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/24/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/18/2002