Refine your search

20 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/25/2002 Became Public Law No: 107-296.
11/25/2002 Signed by President.
11/22/2002 Presented to President.
11/22/2002 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H9040-9114; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9040-9089)
11/19/2002 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 90 - 9. Record Vote Number: 249.(text: CR S11462-11511)
07/26/2002 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 295 - 132 (Roll no. 367).
07/24/2002 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 107-609, Part I. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
07/12/2002 Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Transportation discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Science discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on International Relations discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Intelligence (Permanent) discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Government Reform discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Financial Services discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Armed Services discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Appropriations discharged.
07/12/2002 Committee on Agriculture discharged.
06/24/2002 Introduced in House