Committees: H.R.5005 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/24/2002 Referred to
07/17/2002 Hearings by
07/19/2002 Markup by
07/24/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-609
House Agriculture06/24/2002 Referred to
07/11/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Appropriations06/24/2002 Referred to
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Armed Services06/24/2002 Referred to
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce06/24/2002 Referred to
07/11/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Financial Services06/24/2002 Referred to
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Government Reform06/24/2002 Referred to
07/11/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Intelligence (Permanent)06/24/2002 Referred to
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House International Relations06/24/2002 Referred to
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Judiciary06/24/2002 Referred to
06/27/2002 Hearings by
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Science06/24/2002 Referred to
06/27/2002 Hearings by
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/24/2002 Referred to
07/11/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from
House Ways and Means06/24/2002 Referred to
07/10/2002 Markup by
07/12/2002 Discharged from