There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFER Act
Securing America's Future through Enforcement Reform Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to bar the admission, and facilitate the removal, of alien terrorists and their supporters and fundraisers, to secure our borders against terrorists, drug traffickers, and other illegal aliens, to facilitate the removal of illegal aliens and aliens who are criminals or human rights abusers, to reduce visa, document, employment, and voting fraud, to reform the legal immigration system, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/25/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/18/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/25/2002Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/03/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/10/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/19/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/19/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/19/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary06/25/2002 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims07/18/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5013.


Subjects (143)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2002)

Securing America's Freedom through Enforcement Reform Act of 2002 (SAFER Act) - Sets forth provisions, and amends specified Acts, with respect to: (1) prevention and punishment of alien smuggling, and transporting and harboring of aliens; (2) border patrol increases; (3) use of the military along the border; (4) visas, including the visa waiver program, and consular interviews of applicants; (5) alien terrorist removal, deportability, and asylum requests; (6) alien criminal removal; (7) alien human rights violator removal, deportability, and bar to status adjustment, including criminal penalties for reentry and aiding human rights violators to enter the United States; (8) document security (birth certificates, drivers licenses, social security cards); (9) employment eligibility verification; (10) increased Immigration and Naturalization Service (INS) investigative personnel, (11) expedited exclusion; (12) criminal and civil penalties for improper entry of aliens; (13) voluntary departure; (14) detention facilities; (15) removal proceedings; (16) establishment of a Federal election-related Citizenship Verification Program; (17) establishment of an Office of Citizenship; (18) treatment of nationals of state sponsors of terrorism; (19) refugee admissions, and extended family and employment preferences; (20) elimination of diversity immigrant program; (21) temporary protected status; (22) designation of foreign terrorist organizations; (23) foreign students; (24) INS attorneys; (25) alien proof of identity; and (26) information on foreign crimes.