Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/25/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/17/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 07/17/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/17/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/17/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/24/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/09/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/26/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/26/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/26/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/26/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/03/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/03/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/10/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/10/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/16/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/16/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/19/2002
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/19/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/19/2002