Committees: H.R.503 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/07/2001 Referred to
04/20/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-42
03/28/2001 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution02/20/2001 Referred to
03/21/2001 Reported by
03/21/2001 Markup by
03/15/2001 Hearings by
House Armed Services02/07/2001 Referred to
04/24/2001 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/15/2001 Referred to