Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/07/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/07/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/07/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/13/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/13/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/13/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/27/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/28/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/06/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/13/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/13/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 03/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/14/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/14/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/14/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/20/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/24/2001