Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/17/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/17/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/17/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/30/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/30/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/30/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/30/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/09/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/09/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/09/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/09/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/09/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 10/09/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/21/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/21/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/21/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/21/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/21/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/21/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/13/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/13/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/13/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/13/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/13/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/13/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/13/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/13/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/13/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/13/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/14/2002