Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/12/2002