Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/01/2002