Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/27/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/11/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/11/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/16/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/16/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/16/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/16/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/23/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/17/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/17/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/17/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/17/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/26/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/07/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/07/2002