There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Teacher Tax Relief Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the above-the-line deduction for teacher classroom supplies and to expand such deduction to include qualified professional development expenses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/10/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/12/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1251)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2002Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/25/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/25/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/25/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/26/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/11/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/11/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/11/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/17/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/25/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/25/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/10/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/10/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/14/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/10/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5085. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/2002)

Teacher Tax Relief Act of 2002 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to increase from $250 to $500 the maximum above-the-line deduction allowed for classroom supply expenses incurred by elementary and secondary school teachers, effective after December 31, 2001. Expands such deduction to include qualified professional development expenses.