Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/10/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 07/10/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/16/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/25/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/25/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/25/2002
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/26/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/11/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/11/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/11/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/11/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/11/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/17/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/17/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 09/25/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/25/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/10/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/10/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/10/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/14/2002