Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/28/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/01/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/01/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/01/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/07/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/15/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/15/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/21/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/21/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/21/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/21/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/28/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/08/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/11/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 11/19/2001